Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Department Stores National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Dawn E Carey, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2020NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 10, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: December 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 10, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 08, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 19, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 10, 2020DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 04, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Administrative Review - Discontinued |
||
October 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 19, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISCONTINUANCE R&R FILE# 1320517 |
||
June 22, 2021 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
June 21, 2021 |
NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court |
||
December 10, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1320517 |
||
December 10, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1320517 |
||
December 10, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1320517 | ||
December 10, 2020 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1320517 |
||
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.