Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, A Subsidiary Of First National Of Nebraska, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Stacey J Mark, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Livingston County Supreme Court with Thomas E Moran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas E Moran Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseLivingston County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time283 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01)
Date: June 03, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01)
Date: August 11, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 26, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01)
Date: August 11, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: June 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01)
Date: June 03, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #01)
Date: June 03, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 22, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Affidavit of Mailing: NOE |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #01) Notice of Entry |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #01) | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #01) | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) Adjournment Notice |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #01) Attorney Affirmation |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #01) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.