Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For Morgan Stanley Abs Capital I Inc. Trust 2003-Nc8, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Katz, Jordan S, Landrigan, Kyle Edward, Leopold, Saul O, Medina, Christopher E., Oezcan, Sakine, (total of 7) See All against Americredit Financial Services, Inc, Capital One Bank, Donald Zielinski, Jerica Close, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12,, (total of 7) See All represented by Elliott-Engel, Amaris Laura, Robbins, Jamie S, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1087 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 03, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 04, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 30, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 14, 2020*** DELETED BY COURT ***
Date: December 03, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 05, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 03, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 12, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 03, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2017ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: November 09, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: June 19, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2021SUR-REPLY
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 19, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: June 18, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 19, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 06, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 12, 2017NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)
Date: January 11, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 12, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2018SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: January 11, 2018RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: October 17, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2018FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: December 13, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2018ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 31, 2018ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: January 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01) Assignments Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #01) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 21, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #01)
Date: March 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 18, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: June 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 19, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #02)
Date: July 06, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #02)
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: August 25, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: March 15, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 29, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 29, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: November 18, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 31, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 28, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 16, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 28, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 16, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: March 15, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 31, 2022ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE
Date: March 10, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 05, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 09, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 09, 2023ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 20, 2023 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 07, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 10, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
June 09, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Support of Discontinuance |
||
June 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Answer by Defendant Jerica Close |
||
June 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Summons, Complaint, Lis Pendens, Supplemental Summons, Amended Complaint, and Amended Lis Pendens wi Summons, Complaint, Lis Pendens, Supplemental Summons, Amended Complaint, and Amended Lis Pendens wi ... show more |
||
June 09, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Proposed Order |
||
June 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE (Motion #3) Notice of Motion to Discontinue Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.