Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Katherine T Fisher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Narchus, Nicholas Joseph, against Jesse M Fisher, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis S Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2019 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2019 | MEMORANDUM | ||
December 26, 2019 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
December 24, 2019 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
December 20, 2019 | CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET | ||
December 20, 2019 | UCS - 111 | ||
December 19, 2019 | NOTICE | ||
December 06, 2019 | NOTICE OF GUIDELINE MAINTENANCE | ||
December 06, 2019 | NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC ORDERS | ||
December 06, 2019 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
December 06, 2019 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.