Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Jennifer Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas E Moran presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions454 days |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time454 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 18, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #01)
Date: September 24, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: September 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #01)
Date: September 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #01)
Date: September 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #01)
Date: September 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #01)
Date: September 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 02, 2019JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: December 03, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 24, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 06, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 24, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 24, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 24, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 24, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 03, 2020 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
November 24, 2020 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001)
Judge: Moran, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
November 18, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to defendant notifying her of the virtual appearance. |
||
October 06, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Copy of Letter mailed to the Defendant notifying her of the return date for MSJ. |
||
September 24, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #01) Affidavit of Service of Process |
||
September 24, 2020 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 24, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 24, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #01) Defendant's Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.