Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
New City Funding Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Megan Newland, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Jennifer M. Noto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 15, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 08, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 04, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 08, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 04, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL
Date: December 28, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL | ||
April 06, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 04, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
April 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 22, 2022 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT Order Awarding Attorneys Fees and Authorizing the Entry of Default Judgment |
||
February 08, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
February 08, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
February 08, 2022 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
February 08, 2022 | affidavit of mailing | ||
February 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Military Status |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.