Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Tannya K Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: December 20, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 19, 2019 |
ORDER - OTHER Transmittal Sheet |
||
October 03, 2019 |
NOTICE Administrative Review to the Court |
||
September 25, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1293358 |
||
September 25, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1293358 |
||
September 25, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1293358 |
||
September 25, 2019 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1293358 |
||
September 10, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 10, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 31, 2019 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1293358 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.