Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lawrence Van Wie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gorberg, David J., against Ford Motor Company, represented by Dobis, James S, Russell, Paul K, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis S Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management89 days |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time89 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 26, 2017RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 15, 2017COURT NOTICE
Date: August 16, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 30, 2017ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 15, 2017ANSWER
Date: August 15, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 09, 2017DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 09, 2017ANSWER
Date: August 09, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Cohen (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
September 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Cohen Hearing Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
September 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Cohen (Court Activity) Judge: Cohen, Hon. Dennis S. |
|
September 26, 2017 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 16, 2017 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 15, 2017 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 15, 2017 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
August 15, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Vehicle Documentation |
||
August 15, 2017 | ANSWER | ||
August 09, 2017 | ADMISSION OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.