Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Chemung Canal Trust Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Defazio, Kimberlee Noelle, against Kathryn K Flegal, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Kevin Van Allen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a civil action filed by Chemung Canal Trust Company against Kathryn K. Flegal. The plaintiff, Chemung Canal Trust Company, is a New York State Banking Association. The defendant, Kathryn K. Flegal, resides at 7372 Evergreen Street, ...
PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B statement
Date: June 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note
Date: June 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) stmt showing calculation of amt owed
Date: July 24, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 05, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Intent to Repossess Letter
Date: June 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Collateral Sold Letter
Date: June 19, 2023ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 16, 2023 |
ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judgment and Order |
||
July 27, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
July 26, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
July 26, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 24, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | ||
July 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) summons and complaint |
||
July 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) stmt showing calculation of amt owed stmt showing calculation of amt owed Redacted |
||
July 24, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | ||
July 24, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.