Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Andriana Kobylanski, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bates, Alison Christine, against Zachary Kobylanski, represented by Booth, Katherine Barbara, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Jennifer M. Noto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
June 06, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
June 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 02, 2023 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
June 02, 2023 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 26, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
April 26, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 21, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 21, 2023 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
April 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.