Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Finger Lakes Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Lee T Ward, in the jurisdiction of Livingston County, NY, . Livingston County, NY Superior Courts with Jennifer M. Noto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLivingston County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 29, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2023ORDER - AWARDING FEE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: July 31, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 02, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 31, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: July 31, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
September 29, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 29, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 20, 2023 |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) Order Awarding Attorneys Fees and Authorizing the Entry of Default Judgment |
||
August 02, 2023 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Ex Parte Motion scheduled 09.08.23 |
||
August 02, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
July 31, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Military Status |
||
July 31, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
July 31, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.