Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Keybank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., against Carla D. Keefer, David Keefer, John Doe And Jane Doe Said Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal document filed by KeyBank, N.A. against defendants David Keefer, Carla D. Keefer, and fictitious names "John Doe" and "Jane Doe." The purpose of the complaint is to foreclose a mortgage held by KeyBank on the property locate...
ORDER - REFERENCE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) 90 DAY NOTICE
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 09, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 21, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: September 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 18, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: August 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AFF OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
January 09, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR ORDER OF REFERENCE |
||
January 03, 2024 |
ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1) Order of Reference |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) AFF OF MERIT |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) AFFS OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) AFFS OF SERVICE |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) MORTGAGE |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) SUMMONS & COMPLAINT |
||
November 09, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) NOTE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.