Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Lori S. Darling-Johnson, Individually And As Administrator Of The Estate Of Melinda M. Darling,, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Julian, Robert F., Palmer, Stephanie Ann, against Dyana Manning Rpa-C, Gyn Oncology Of Cny, P.C.,, Kathryn E. Mchugh, Lowville Medical Associates, Llp,, Steven L. Lyndaker M.D., (total of 7) See All represented by Johnson, Eric Gates, Kelly, Sarah Murnane, Mattison, Zachary Martin, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is filed by Lori S. Darling-Johnson, both individually and as the Administrator of the Estate of Melinda M. Darling. The complaint is against Wiley D. Bunn, Jr., M.D., Suzanne Volcko, M.N.P., GYN Oncology of CNY, P.C., Steven L. Lyndak...
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 18, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2023SUMMONS
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
September 15, 2023 | Answer - Dr. McHugh | ||
September 15, 2023 | Answer - Lowville Medical Associates | ||
September 15, 2023 | Answer - RPA-C Manning | ||
September 15, 2023 | Answer - Dr. Lyndaker | ||
September 13, 2023 |
ANSWER of Suzanne M. Volcko, N.P. |
||
September 13, 2023 |
ANSWER of Wiley D. Bunn, Jr., M.D. |
||
September 12, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT DARLING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SEC. OF STATE ON GYN ONCOLOGY OF CNY, PC. |
||
September 12, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT DARLING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON KATHERYN MCHUGH, MD. |
||
September 12, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT DARLING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON LOWVILLE MEDICAL ASSOCIATES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.