Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Adirondack Steel Works, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Farley, Timothy Alan, against Jason White, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Adirondack Steel Works, Inc. against Jason White. The plaintiff alleges that they manufactured certain steel items for the defendant as per their request and delivered them. The defendant agreed to pay for ...
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 31, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 31, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 16, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.