Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Community Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Burgess, Peter Landon, against Paul D. Dafoe Sr. A K A Paul D. Dafoe A K A Paul Dafoe, The People Of The State Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 01, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 02, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 01, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 01, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #1) Proposed Order |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #1) Affirmation of Regularity |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #1) 1303 Notice |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mortgagee |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Note |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #1) Affidavits of Additional Mailing |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
||
December 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Certificate of Merit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.