Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carthage Savings & Loan National Association As Successor In Interest To Carthage Federal Savings And Loan Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Farley, Timothy Alan, against Capital One Bank, Carmen Nichols, Estate Of Ronald W. Deitrich, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, United States Of America, (total of 5) See All represented by Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 31, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: August 03, 2023FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 06, 2023APPENDIX
Date: September 06, 2023AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: February 26, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: April 25, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: February 26, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 26, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: April 25, 2023OATH
Date: April 25, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 17, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 25, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 06, 2023JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: May 22, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 26, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: February 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 06, 2023 | APPENDIX | ||
September 06, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 03, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
July 28, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
May 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
May 17, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 25, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE | ||
April 25, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
April 25, 2023 | OATH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.