Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
21St Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Budd, Alexander Morris, Catalfimo, Michael J., against And, John Jane Doe 1 Through John Jane Doe 10 (Said Last Ten Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Other Tenants, Occupants Or Other Persons Or Entities Having Or Claiming An Interest In The Real Property Which Is The Subject Of This Action, Whose Identity Is Not Presently Known To Plaintiff), Constance A. Klossner A K A Constance A. Hawk, Jason R. Klossner, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
And, John Jane Doe 1 Through John Jane Doe 10 (Said Last Ten Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Other Tenants, Occupants Or Other Persons Or Entities Having Or Claiming An Interest In The Real Property Which Is The Subject Of This Action, Whose Identity Is Not Presently Known To Plaintiff)
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: October 10, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: October 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 17, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 18, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: November 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 25, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 16, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 16, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE re: Bankruptcy Stay & Cancellation of Conference |
||
January 25, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter from Defendant Dated 1-12-23 |
||
January 25, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 27, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Settlement Conference Information |
||
November 30, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 18, 2022 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
November 18, 2022 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
November 18, 2022 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
November 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CONSTANCE A. KLOSSNER, A/K/A CONSTANCE A. HAWK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.