Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Erie Boulevard Hydropower, L.P., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by D'Ambrogio, Emanuela, Mc Namara, Mark Ryan, Sullivan, Debra Chini, against Town Of Croghan, Town Of Croghan Assessor, Town Of Croghan Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Burrows, James A., Lewis, Jeffrey Michael, Mccarthy, Ryan Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 21, 2022PETITION
Date: July 21, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 21, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 17, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 15, 2023STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES
Date: May 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 14, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 15, 2023STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: May 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 12, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE To be So Ordered |
||
May 23, 2023 | STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES | ||
May 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Income & Expense Statement |
||
May 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCOVERY Amended Stipulation and Scheduling Order |
||
May 15, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Regarding Equalization Rates |
||
May 15, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Amended Stipulation & Scheduling Order |
||
November 17, 2022 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
August 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS Certified Mail |
||
August 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.