Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alvarez, Maria B., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Alvarez, Ernesto, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Victoria D. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions503 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time503 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 931240-OSC Hearing (Enforcement); Maria B. Alvarez vs Ernesto Alvarez Motion OSC Details: 911170 - Contempt/Failure to Comply ; Judge: J21980 Wood Victoria Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request 929110-Request Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service REQUEST [929110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause-Enforcement (DCSS) 914223-Order: Show Cause (Enforcement) Motion/OSC Detail: 911170 - Contempt/Failure to Comply Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER: SHOW CAUSE (ENFORCEMENT) [914223] Motion: CONTEMPT/FAILURE TO COMPLY [911170] Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing 915310-Hearing: Review; Maria B. Alvarez vs Ernesto Alvarez ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Additional Info : contempt status Judge: Price, Diane |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.