Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
E. L., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Duquin, Scott Michael, Herman, Jeffrey Marc, Marques, Nicole Terese Capton, against Harrisville Central District School, Harrisville Elementary School, represented by Miller, Frank William, Murphy, Thomas John, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 15, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 30, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2021ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: July 27, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 14, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 27, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: September 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 07, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 18, 2021SUMMONS
Date: March 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 12, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 12, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 03, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 16, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 04, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 21, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 12, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - TRANSFER
Date: March 30, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: March 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 20, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Plaintiff's Correspondence to Judge Request to Amend PC Order |
||
August 30, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Jury Trial March 4, 2024 |
||
July 27, 2023 | ORDER - TRANSFER | ||
July 27, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Pre-Trial Conference August 30, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. |
||
July 14, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
May 30, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Amended Preliminary Conference Order for Child Victim Act Cases |
||
February 21, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Amended Preliminary Conference Order for Child Victim Act Cases |
||
November 21, 2022 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Amended Preliminary Conference Order for Child Victim Act Cases |
||
August 03, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Amended Preliminary Conference Order for Child Victim Act Cases |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.