Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Northern Credit Union F K A Northern Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Andrea L Peebles, Justin D Peebles, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 22, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 17, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 30, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 13, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 26, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2) *Corrected*
Date: July 19, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2022 |
ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER (Motion #2) Vacates 7/11/22 Order |
||
July 19, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) affidavit in support of motion to vacate |
||
July 19, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-D (Motion #2) summons and complaint, affidavit of service, Order for severance and judgment, bk notice summons and complaint, affidavit of service, Order for severance and judgment, bk notice Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
July 19, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) *Corrected* proposed order to vacate order |
||
July 12, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) affidavit of service Justin |
||
March 22, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-J (Motion #2) contract, transaction summary, summons and complaint, affidavits of service, affidavits of addl mail contract, transaction summary, summons and complaint, affidavits of service, affidavits of addl mail ... show more |
||
March 16, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.