Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
St Elizabeth Medical Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Spinner, Mark David, against Renee Reese, Robert Reese, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time88 days |
ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 21, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 06, 2018COURT NOTICE
Date: November 23, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2018EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 21, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 21, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 14, 2018 | ORDER - EXPARTE | ||
December 13, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
December 13, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
December 13, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
November 23, 2018 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 21, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons, Complaint and Affidavits of Service |
||
November 21, 2018 |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Permission to file affidavit of service nunc pro tunc |
||
November 21, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
November 21, 2018 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.