Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Scott E Clemons, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Matteson, Adam Roy, against Liza M Clemons, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2018 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time567 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
January 15, 2020 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 08, 2020 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
January 08, 2020 | Hearing |
POST-SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
December 18, 2019 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE AND FINDIN (Motion #001) Decided: 01/07/2020GRANTED Before Justice: CHARLES C. MERRELL Answer demanded: No Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
December 18, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
November 06, 2019 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
November 06, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.