Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Paul A K A Lyndaker, Paul M Lyndaker, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions331 days |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time330 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 06, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 06, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 21, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 21, 2019 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
June 21, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT non-military affidavit |
||
June 21, 2019 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
June 21, 2019 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
April 04, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 04, 2019 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 09, 2019 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
January 08, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
January 08, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.