Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, NY, . Lewis County, NY Superior Courts with CHARLES C. MERRELL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 12, 2016 |
CategoryForeclosure Conf Ineligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT MERRELL (Court Activity) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
January 30, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
January 19, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
September 20, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
August 18, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
|
July 12, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MERRELL (Motion Part) Judge: CHARLES C. MERRELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.