Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Retained Realty Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Confusione, Lisa M, against Columbia University Medical Center Anesthesia Services, Herbert E Koenig, Susan R Koenig, The New York State Department Of Taxation & Finance, represented by Garber, Maria Gabriela, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Derefim B. Neckles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Judgment of foreclosure and sale
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Summons and complaint
Date: April 17, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 17, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Fully briefed underlying motion and cross-motion
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 16, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Summons and complaint
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Loan modifcation
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 05, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #14)
Date: August 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #14)
Date: August 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 05, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #14)
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: August 05, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: August 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 05, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: February 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 05, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: February 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - U
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - T
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: December 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Decision 6/14/2010 |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Loan modification |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Granted order of reference |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Judgment of foreclosure and sale Judgment of foreclosure and sale Redacted |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavits of service |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and complaint Summons and complaint Redacted |
||
April 17, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Affirmation in opposition to Defendant's motion to reargue |
||
April 17, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - U Decision |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S Appeal decision |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.