Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Haim Shlomo Kolp, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Liba Ester Kolp, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Rachel Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRachel Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2018 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | WITNESS LIST | ||
March 22, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
March 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
March 21, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
March 21, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
March 21, 2022 | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | ||
February 10, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 26, 2021 | Hearing |
5FC
Judge: Adams, Hon. Rachel Amy |
|
October 24, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
October 24, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.