Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
New Residential Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against America'S Wholesale Lender, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Edna Fouerte, Maurice Mosseri, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Zamenhof, Alex, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, New Residential Mortgage, LLC, is seeking a declaration from the court that they are the mortgagee of record for a property locate...
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 03, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 07, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) NOA by MERS |
||
January 03, 2024 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Consenting to Judgment by Defendant MERS |
||
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service-EDNA FOUERTE |
||
December 28, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
December 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service-MAURICE MOSSERI |
||
December 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - MAURICE MOSSERI |
||
December 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - EDNA FOUERTE |
||
December 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - MAURICE MOSSERI |
||
December 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - EDNA FOUERTE |
||
December 21, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Consent to Judgement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.