Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bdj Equities Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fleischmann, Jeffrey, against 312 Evergreen Ave Llc, City Of New York Environmental Control Board, John Doe 1-John Doe 100, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein., Mendel Steiner, Nyc Department Of Finance, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a commercial foreclosure action filed by BDJ Equities LLC against 312 Evergreen Ave LLC, Mendel Steiner, NYC Department of Finance, NYS Department of Taxation and Finance, City of New York Environmental Control Board, and John Doe 1...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: January 18, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 18, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
January 18, 2024 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 04, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NYS Department of Taxation and Finance |
||
December 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Mendel Steiner |
||
December 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 312 Evergreen Ave LLC |
||
December 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - City of New York Environmental Control Board |
||
December 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NYC Department of Finance |
||
December 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Guarantee |
||
December 07, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.