Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Donnette Isaacs-Davis, Donnette Isaac-Davis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mastrodomenico, Donald, against Lawrence Davis, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Joanne D Quinones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
January 23, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 09, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 09, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
November 09, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
November 01, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 14, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
September 06, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 06, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.