Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association, As Trustee For Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2023-2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sanda, Gregory James, against 144 Nassau Avenue Llc, Frank Pietrucha, John Doe #1- #50 And Mary Roe #1- #50, The Last Two Names Being Fictitious, It Being Intended To Name All Other Parties Who May Have Some Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint, Jspt Holdings, Inc., New York City Department Of Finance, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Lawrence Knipel presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure summons filed by U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Velocity Commercial Capital Loan Trust 2023-2, against 144 Nassau Avenue LLC, Frank Pietrucha, JSPT Holdings, Inc., and various government ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 22, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ADWOKAT LAW OFFICE SHA JOHN DOE #2 |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KELSEY DOE LAST NAME REFUSED SHA MARY ROE #5 |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MEGAN DOE LAST NAME REFUSED SHA MARY ROE #4 MAILING |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MEGAN DOE LAST NAME REFUSED SHA MARY ROE #4 |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT MAILING |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JAKE DOE LAST NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #4 |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JAKE DOE LAST NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE #4 MAILING |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE NAME REFUSED SHA JOHN DOE NO 3 MAILING |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KELSEY DOE LAST NAME REFUSED SHA MARY ROE #5 MAILING |
||
January 03, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JANE DOE NAME REFUSED SHA MARY ROE #3 MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.