Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Iftikhar Din, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Harvis, Gabriel Paul, against Abraham Quinones, Boston Scientific Corporation, City Of New York, Frantz Souffrant, Jason Chapman, (total of 10) See All represented by , Pervez, Nadia M., Vega, Dennis E., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Heela Capell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Malicious Prosecution) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Iftikhar Din, is suing Boston Scientific Corporation, Abraham Quinones, Sunil Tripathi, Jason Chapman, Tina Napolitano, City of New York, Monet Al...
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 19, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: January 17, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 02, 2024ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: December 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 02, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 02, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) with cross-claims |
||
January 15, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FRANTZ SOUFFRANT |
||
January 02, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #2) Memo of Law in Support |
||
January 02, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion to Dismiss |
||
January 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Exhibit A _ Summons and Complaint |
||
January 02, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion to Dismiss |
||
December 19, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
December 07, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
December 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Complaint |
||
December 07, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.