Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dab Realty Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against 1001 Rogers Ave Llc, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Carolyn E Wade presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn E Wade Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Removal Of Encroachment) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 27, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Notice of Motion to Compel |
||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS on Motion |
||
October 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) DAB Realty - Ex. C - Initial Demands with AOS |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) DAB Realty - Ex. E - GF Letter and Email re. GF Letter 8.15.2023 _ |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) DAB Realty - Ex. A - Summons and Complaint |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) DAB Realty - Ex. B - Verified Answer |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) DAB Realty - Ex. D - 1st GF Letter |
||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.