Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
35 Nep Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Declaratory Relief) case represented by Bhushan, Natraj Saddival, against City Of New York, represented by Collins, Kevin B, Paul, Jasmine, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Consuelo Mallafre Melendez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Declaratory Relief) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
|
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 09, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 09, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 09, 2022STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: March 07, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: April 24, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 07, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 07, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
April 24, 2023 | STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
March 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
December 09, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
December 09, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
December 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 09, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
December 09, 2022 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Motion to Dismiss |
||
December 09, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.