Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Virginia Lopez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ahmed, Usman, Licatesi, Anthony J., against Ariel Kohanghadosh, Highline Leasing, Llc, Mehran Kohanghadosh, Rafael Kohanghadosh, represented by Kutner, Kenneth J., Neiman, Joseph H., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Francois A Rivera presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: May 10, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 10, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 11, 2023STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 27, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 28, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Combined Demands |
||
July 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Copy of Police Report |
||
July 27, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Court Order dated July 7, 2023 |
||
July 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 25, 2023 |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Stipulation to Withdraw Motion Returnable 7/27/23 |
||
July 11, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint |
||
June 26, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Demand for Bill of Particulars and Combined Demands |
||
June 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.