Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Adaury Rosario, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Elefterakis, Nicholas, Friedman, Taylor Mical, against Herrera Toscano Express Llc, Ronal Almonte, represented by Fishkin, Robert Adam, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Adaury Rosario, is seeking monetary damages for injuries sustained as a result of the defendants' negligence. The defendants named in the complain...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 17, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 22, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
ANSWER Verified Answer & Demands |
||
January 22, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service - Answer & Demands |
||
January 09, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending time to Answer |
||
December 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RONAL ALMONTE |
||
November 17, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HERRERA TOSCANO EXPRESS LLC |
||
October 27, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.