Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Jennifer Senderowitz, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Goddard, Megan Sarah, Salomone, Desiree Rebecca, against Hebrew Academy For Special Children, Naomi Goldzweig, Therapeutic Services, Inc., represented by Grimaldi, Carmelo, Maree, Damien O'Hara, Radi, Mark Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 10, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Employment Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This comprehensive legal document outlines a complaint filed by Jennifer Senderowitz against Hebrew Academy for Special Children (HASC), Therapeutic Services, Inc. (TSI), and Naomi Goldzweig. The complaint alleges various violations, including severe...
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI)
Date: February 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 02, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 05, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 11, 2024ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 21, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: December 05, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2023SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: December 05, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 02, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: October 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) | ||
February 02, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A District Court Notice of Removal with Exhibits |
||
January 22, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 12, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 12, 2024 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER extending time to answer or respond to the complaint until 2/26/24 |
||
January 11, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 08, 2024 |
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Service of Complaint on Defendant TSI |
||
December 22, 2023 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER extending time to answer or respond to the complaint until 1/25/24 |
||
December 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Service of Summons with Notice on Defendant Therapeutic Services, Inc. |
||
December 05, 2023 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.