Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kevin Griffin, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ndanusa, Mustapha Lakpene, against Ab & I Realty & Management Llc, represented by Sidrane, Steven D, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Edgar G Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEdgar G Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: March 23, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Hearing |
INTAKE PART
Judge: EDGAR G. WALKER |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Secretary of State |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.