Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martell Mitchell, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Greenstein, Robert J, Milbauer, Seth, against Bway-Pilling Laundromat, Inc., Rgp Management Realty #A, represented by Borofsky, Steven Jay, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Katherine Levine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKatherine Levine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 23, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 09, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for insurance, statements, photograghs, surveillance and D&I |
||
December 14, 2021 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 12/10/21 |
||
December 09, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Central Compliance Conference Order |
||
February 17, 2021 | Hearing |
CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART
Judge: PAMELA L. FISHER, PART 94 |
|
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
HELD INTAKE PART Judge: PAMELA L. FISHER, PART 94 |
|
March 31, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED INTAKE PART Judge: PAMELA L. FISHER, PART 94 |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.