Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Earnell Chisolm, filed a(n) Torts - Other (Civil Rights) case represented by Robin, Caitlin Anne, against Police Officers John Does Numbers One Through Ten, Sean Walsh P.O Shield No. 7614, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Katherine Levine presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Civil Rights) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
CITY DISC. PRELIMINARY CONF ADM ADJ Judge: KATHERINE LEVINE, PT. 25 |
|
August 17, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CITY DISC. PRELIMINARY CONF ADM ADJ Judge: KATHERINE LEVINE, PT. 25 |
|
May 11, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CITY DISC. PRELIMINARY CONF Judge: KATHERINE LEVINE, PT. 25 |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Preliminary Conference Request | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service - The City of New York | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.