Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Andy G. Mcalpin A K A Andy Mcalpin, Bnei Avrom, Hanuk Inc., John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 7) See All represented by Breault, Jill Cori, Smith, David Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Partnow-For.Resolution Pt 2 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 12, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2019ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 12, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 28, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 02, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 20, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 05, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FILE |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215 - "JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE #6 |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215 - "JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE #7 |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215 - "JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE #8 |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215 - "JOHN DOE" (REFUSED NAME) AS JOHN DOE #9 |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE 3215 - GREGORY LITTLE AS JOHN DOE #10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.