Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Robinson, Justin Paul, against Dashan T. Manners, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Nera Manners, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, (total of 7) See All represented by Schwartz, Beth Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Partnow-For.Resolution Pt 2 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time273 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 26, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 12, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: February 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 07, 2020ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 07, 2020ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2020 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF A MOTION FOR. RESOLUTION PT 1-COVID FPSA 4/1/20 Judge: SHEARES-FOR. RESOLUTION PT 1 |
|
September 28, 2020 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 28, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) FOR. RESOLUTION PART1-MOTION Judge: SHEARES-FOR. RESOLUTION PT 1 |
|
September 24, 2020 | Hearing |
DECIDED (Motion #001) FOR. RESOLUTION PART1-MOTION ADV FROM 10/9 Judge: SHEARES-FOR. RESOLUTION PT 1 |
|
September 04, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: SHEARES-FOR. RESOLUTION PT 1 |
|
August 27, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.