Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Joni Johnson-Rasaili, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Yadgarov, Robert, against 763 Eastern Associates Llc., represented by Bamundo, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with DAWN M. JIMENEZ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip/Trip And/Or Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: March 21, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Hearing |
CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART
Judge: DAWN M. JIMENEZ SALTA, PT 88 |
|
September 04, 2020 | Hearing |
HELD INTAKE PART Judge: DAWN M. JIMENEZ SALTA, PT 88 |
|
August 26, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED INTAKE PART Judge: DAWN M. JIMENEZ SALTA, PT 88 |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
March 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer with Demands | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Receipt - 763 Eastern Associates, LLC |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 763 EASTERN ASSOCIATES LLC |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.