Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Evaristo Morales, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, Thaens, Christopher Charles, against 315 Liberty Ave Llc, Antonio Coleman, Damian Burgess, Dawood Kassim, J & Gconstruction Services, Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Pierre Louis, Alicia Annmarie, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 16, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 01, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 10, 2020ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 05, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 17, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOS affidavit and reciept for J & G Construction Services Inc. |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DOS affidavit and reciept for 315 Liberty Ave LLC |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER (AMENDED) ANSWER |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.