Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aholiav Mizrachi Decedent, By And Through, Limor Abady As Administrator Of The Estate Of Aholiav Mizrachi, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Katsnelson, Elliott, against Sheepshead Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, Llc, represented by Essadiq, Danny Paul Karim, Ptashnik, Neil B, Sheeley, Andrew Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kings Djmp presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 06, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2020ANSWER *Corrected*
Date: November 16, 2020ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 28, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 16, 2020ANSWER *Corrected*
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 02, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 02, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: March 15, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 16, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 02, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 12, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2022 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) Dated: October 24, 2022 |
||
August 25, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Arons Authorizations |
||
November 19, 2021 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 11/15/21 |
||
October 06, 2021 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
May 12, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 15, 2021 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
March 15, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
March 02, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION PART Judge: DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION PART |
|
December 02, 2020 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion |
||
December 02, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Verified Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.