Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Galina Azhazha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Salem, Mark, against John Doe Whose First And Last Name Is Unknown And Fictitious And Unknown And Whose Badge Number Is Unknown, New York City Transit Authority, represented by Zentz, Michael Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kings Cdp25 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time28 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 13, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 08, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 13, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 13, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.