Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gregory Davis, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Biolsi, Steven Alexander, Jacobson, Joseph Aaron, Sweify, Mohamed Fathy Metwally, against Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, Doing Business As Christiana Trust Not In Its Individual Capacity, But Solely As Trustee For Bronze Creek Title Trust 2014-Wfb1, represented by Singh, Mitra, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Ingrid Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Rpapl Art 15 Mortgage Dis) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: May 13, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: May 13, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 12, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 02, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: May 13, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: May 13, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 29, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 07, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 29, 2021ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 07, 2021APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY)
Date: September 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 |
APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) Dated August 23, 2023 |
||
August 24, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 07, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 07, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) dated 3/24/21 |
||
February 02, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Attorney's Affirmation in Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Reargue |
||
January 29, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION | ||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Notice of Appeal in Foreclosure Action |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Dismissal of Appeal |
||
January 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Dismiss |
||
January 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.