Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ignatius Francis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Loiodice, Vincent Charles, against Colly Varcianna, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp20 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Ignatius Francis, is suing the defendants, Colly Varcianna and the City of New York. The complaint alleges that the defendants wer...
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2024ANSWER
Date: October 23, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 13, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 22, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 13, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 13, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 13, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 23, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
September 18, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.