Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vladimer Popovi, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Groveman, Liba N., Viener, Joseph B, against Carmen Gallardo, represented by Vultaggio, Toniann, Withey, Peter James, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Richard Montelione presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 31, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 12, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 09, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 11, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 31, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 12, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Photos |
||
March 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Estimate |
||
March 12, 2021 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
March 11, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Central Compliance Part Conference dated 03/09/2021 |
||
March 09, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 09, 2021 | Hearing |
CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART
Judge: EDGAR G. WALKER |
|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
HELD INTAKE PART Judge: EDGAR G. WALKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.