Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Sandur, Samantha, Wrazen, Brandon Michael, against Aj Logan Partners Corp., Blossom Mingo, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, (total of 8) See All represented by Rosengarten, Solomon, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Carl J Landicino presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 11, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 16, 2020ANSWER
Date: December 17, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 11, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 11, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2020ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: June 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) RPAPL 1304 90 Day Notice
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1) Affidavit in Support of Motion
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N/A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2020ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 08, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2023SUR-REPLY
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's March 10, 2023 Letter |
||
March 10, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
January 30, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) DTD 1/25/2023 |
||
January 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF REJECTION (Motion #1) Notice of Rejection of Defendant's Sur Reply |
||
January 23, 2023 | SUR-REPLY | ||
January 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) E-MAIL FROM COURT |
||
January 20, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) REQUEST FOR ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT |
||
November 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
November 09, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.